BARNABAS COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1160839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £59.61k £76.99k £73.60k £107.54k £190.84k
Total expenditure £49.28k £61.09k £70.78k £86.81k £81.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A