Trustees BIDEFORD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1159942

Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HENRY ROSSER | Chair | 01 March 1990 |
|
|
||||
Jo Sparrow | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lawrence | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kay Renton Renton | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Found Hooper | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terry Wilkinson | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN ROSSER | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN MARSHALL | Trustee | 01 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
VERA ANN CHAMBERLIN | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY DOUGHTY | Trustee | 01 March 1989 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JANE SPEED | Trustee | 01 March 1987 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.