BLAISE COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity number: 1160376
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.11k £13.95k £7.82k £9.33k £21.16k
Total expenditure £4.19k £12.41k £7.63k £10.64k £9.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A