Accounts and annual returns NEEDS AFRICA

Charity number: 1162760
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window