Trustees BANANA ENTERPRISE NETWORK LIMITED
Charity number: 1161408

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NORMA LEE | Chair | 13 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Janet Kaneen | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Goulding | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wilfred William Samuel Addison | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth John Morton | Trustee | 29 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS TYLDESLEY | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.