BROADSTAIRS TOWN TEAM LTD

Charity number: 1163509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 December 2016 On time Download