ALFORD MEMORIAL PARK

Charity number: 1160615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time Download