ALFORD MEMORIAL PARK

Charity number: 1160615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £35.38k £3.16k £5.74k £5.16k £1.39k
Total expenditure £4.75k £9.72k £4.13k £10.15k £1.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.20k £3.00k £5.00k £5.00k N/A