Accounts and annual returns IMPACT PLANET

Charity number: 1161297
Charity reporting is overdue by 705 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 340 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 340 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 705 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 705 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 February 2020 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 February 2020 98 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window