THE PHOENIX YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1160177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £144.96k £158.26k £159.33k £194.70k £162.91k
Total expenditure £137.66k £149.21k £147.04k £158.68k £142.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.13k £0 £10.00k N/A £25.32k