THE PHOENIX YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1160177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL PRIESTLEY Trustee 07 March 2017
THE REACT FOUNDATION Received: On time
COPELAND RUGBY LEAGUE DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION Received: On time
John Alick Trustee 26 October 2017 None on record
Paul Zanacchi Trustee 19 September 2014 None on record
STEVEN BUTTERWORTH Chair 13 June 2011 None on record
MARGARET MALLOY Trustee 10 January 2008 None on record
IVAN PHILLIP BALDWIN Trustee 03 June 2013 None on record