LONDON BAT GROUP

Charity number: 1160872
Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 February 2021 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 08 February 2021 193 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 September 2019 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 22 September 2019 54 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 03 September 2017 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 03 September 2017 3 days late Download