RUTLAND MAGISTRATES FUND

Charity number: 505782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2021 05 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2019 10 February 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 Not Required