Accounts and annual returns SICKLE AND ME
Charity number: 1163716
Charity reporting is overdue by 788 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 57 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 57 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 423 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 423 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 788 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 788 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 18 June 2021 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 May 2020
(These accounts |
18 June 2021 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2019 | 18 June 2021 | 474 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2019 | 18 June 2021 | 474 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window