Trustees JUST OLDER YOUTH CIO
Charity number: 1163575
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE KEANE | Chair | 09 June 2008 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN GILBERT | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN SIMPSON | Trustee | 11 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
LOIS NUTT | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CARTER | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
FREDA JOHNSON | Trustee | 09 June 2008 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA IRENE CLAXTON | Trustee | 09 June 2008 |
|
|
||||
CORAL ANN WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 09 June 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.