Governing document PENRITH MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
Charity number: 505809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/05/1977 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/1992 AS AMENDED ON 04/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 04/03/2015 as amended on 06 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO SEARCH FOR AND RESCUE PERSONS WHO ARE LOST OR ARE IN DIFFICULTIES ON THE FELLS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE LAKES/PENNINES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.