GERMAN CHOIR OF LONDON

Charity number: 1162894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.34k £44.97k £26.08k £43.28k £19.68k
Total expenditure £24.62k £26.37k £36.41k £36.73k £19.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A