IRONBRIDGE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 505818
Charity reporting is overdue by 1765 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/05/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £4.85k £2.38k £7.56k £7.54k £6.83k
Total expenditure £1.56k £1.87k £6.34k £7.25k £6.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A