INSPIRE DIALOGUE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164471
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 May 2019 31 July 2020 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2019 31 July 2020 138 days late Download
Annual return 15 May 2018 31 July 2019 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2018 13 August 2019 151 days late Download
Annual return 15 May 2017 14 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2017 14 March 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)