INSPIRE DIALOGUE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164471
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Petronella Panerus Trustee 16 September 2017 None on record
Dr PHILIP WIGGE Trustee 17 November 2015 None on record
DR Ho Sung Cho Trustee 15 September 2015 None on record
Sylvia Willis Trustee 17 September 2017 None on record
Claudio Gutierrez Trustee 16 September 2017 None on record
Dr Rowan Douglas Williams Trustee 19 November 2015
CHRISTIAN AID Charity reporting is up to date
DR JOHN MILLINGTON SCHOLARSHIP CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date