NAMIBIA PROJECT

Charity number: 1163681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £89.55k £120.29k £75.29k £294 £20.26k
Total expenditure £48.48k £81.08k £62.83k £56.96k £27.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A