Financial history ALI'S GIFT

Charity number: 1162396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £22.00k £10.02k £6.51k £4.13k £7.08k
Total expenditure £4.84k £2.39k £2.61k £3.81k £11.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A