Trustees WORLD SPORT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1161465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Webb-Peploe Chair 08 June 2020
None on record
Arnaud Melinard Trustee 10 November 2024
None on record
Timothy Richard Jones Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Alison Sturgess-Durden Trustee 09 March 2019
None on record
GRAHAM MASSEY Trustee 02 November 2015
None on record