CENTRE FOR AGEING BETTER LIMITED

Charity number: 1160741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nuzhat Ali Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Jane Ericson Trustee 28 September 2020 None on record
Dawid Konotey-Ahulu Trustee 18 September 2020
LEGACY OF WAR FOUNDATION Received: 17 days late
CHINEKE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Daniel Oppenheimer Trustee 09 March 2020
ROYAL BRITISH LEGION POPPY LOTTERY LIMITED Received: On time
DAME CAROL BLACK Trustee 01 May 2019
INSTITUTE FOR EMPLOYMENT STUDIES Received: On time
Margaret Dangoor Trustee 01 August 2017
RICHMOND UPON THAMES CROSSROADS CARE SCHEME Received: On time
Cathy Garner Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Benjamin Page Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR Nicholas Barron Mays Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Dame Lin Homer DCB Trustee 21 August 2017
THE ROYAL ANNIVERSARY TRUST Received: On time