AL KHIDMAH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 February 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 February 2020 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 March 2017 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required