BOURNE ELSEA PARK CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY ACADEMY PARENT TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1163449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.22k £3.92k £4.90k £10.10k £4.33k
Total expenditure £2.12k £5.18k £5.48k £5.70k £7.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A