Trustees GUJARAT HINDU SOCIETY, PRESTON
Charity Number: 505959

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DASHRATHBHAI H NAYEE | Chair | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jinabhai Mithabhai Patel | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amratbhai Limbachia | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jashuben Parekh | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ketankumar Vara | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ishwer D Tailor MBE JP DL | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nimesh Parmar | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kamalkant Parekh | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amratlal Patel | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dhanuben T Patel | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bharat Govind Maru | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ashit Maheshchandra Jariwala | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mahendra Marolia | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PRAHLADBHAI S NAYEE | Trustee | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Balvantrai Panchal | Trustee | 23 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
RAMANBHAI S VALAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.