Trustees CARIBBEAN AND AFRICAN COMMUNITY HEALTH SUPPORT FORUM
Charity number: 1162605
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leroy Edwards | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diamond James | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Akrofi | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deloreta Williams | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ETHLYN BEATON | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.