BLACKPOOL SMILE

Charity number: 1161675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 April 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 August 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 February 2019 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required