BLACKPOOL SMILE

Charity number: 1161675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.48k £2.53k £2.72k £3.28k £3.18k
Total expenditure £5.73k £4.24k £3.64k £2.54k £3.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A