Financial history STOCKPORT MUSLIM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163915
Charity reporting is overdue by 265 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £55.55k £64.79k £65.22k £62.85k £65.29k
Total expenditure £42.12k £57.34k £65.01k £67.46k £56.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.12k £8.97k