HAPPY HOURS CLUB

Charity number: 1161030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £11.29k £10.24k £10.65k £7.12k £10.88k
Total expenditure £11.67k £11.55k £9.57k £7.46k £10.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A