Financial history EASTWELL HISTORY GROUP

Charity number: 1163802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.33k £3.08k £5.88k £4.18k £3.06k
Total expenditure £3.56k £3.11k £4.19k £3.60k £2.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A