Financial history Bude Primary Academy Parent Teacher Association

Charity number: 1161296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £5.40k £2.35k £881 £313 £5.07k
Total expenditure £1.34k £7.53k £3.50k £338 £6.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A