BOWDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 April 2021 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 April 2021 68 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 June 2019 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 June 2019 140 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 November 2017 On time Download