ALQUITY TRANSFORMING LIVES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £5.93k £233.37k £404.58k £292.16k £222.77k
Total expenditure £18 £93.19k £104.55k £187.51k £401.97k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A