Accounts and annual returns PUNTLAND PROGRESS COALITION

Charity number: 1167763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 June 2021 25 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2021 25 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 June 2020 25 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2020 25 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 June 2019 18 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2019 18 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 June 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2018 24 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 June 2017 16 May 2018 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2017 08 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window