IN THEIR NAME

Charity number: 1164514
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 March 2021 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 26 March 2021 49 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 26 March 2021 415 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 26 March 2021 415 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 February 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 22 February 2019 17 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download