Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS, FULBOURN

Charity number: 1162261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ALICE ABIGAIL GOODMAN Chair 01 October 2011
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Received: On time
ANNE WARD (OR WAAD)
Received: On time
WESTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
FARMER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Received: On time
THE JAMES BENSTEAD CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ST NICHOLAS GREAT WILBRAHAM TRUST
Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
David Francis Sheppard Trustee 08 August 2020
WESTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
FARMER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
TOWNLEY MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
Dr Jordan Kay Savage Trustee 08 August 2020
None on record
Dr Andrew Garth Tristram Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
ANNE KAREN MARIE FRANCOISE SWAYSLAND Trustee 13 April 2015
None on record
SALLY ANN HAMES Trustee 07 April 2014
None on record
David McKinley Gant Trustee 23 April 2012
WESTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
FARMER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
Dr ANITA LILIAN WHITEHEAD Trustee 14 April 2011
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
STEPHEN MASHFORD Trustee 14 April 2006
KESWICK HALL CHARITY
Received: On time