Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY FOR NEUROENDOCRINOLOGY
Charity number: 1163115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR NEIL EVANS BSC, PHD | Chair | 29 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alejandro Ibanez-Costa PhD | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matei Bolborea MSc PhD | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chinedu Theresa Momoh | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jo Edward Lewis | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Karen Anne Spencer | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paula Jane Brunton | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Allan Edward Herbison | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Anne Dumbell-Routledge BSc, PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MARIA CANAL BSC, PHD | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR MICHELLE BELLINGHAM BSC, PHD | Trustee | 29 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR Kate Ellacott PhD | Trustee | 29 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gisela Helfer BSc, PhD | Trustee | 29 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HELEN CHRISTIAN BSC PHD MA | Trustee | 12 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR PREETHI JETHWA | Trustee | 12 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.