Financial history EGERTON FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1162040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £159.65k £197.34k £206.90k £190.98k £150.59k
Total expenditure £160.67k £193.20k £205.90k £190.06k £153.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A