Dogfen lywodraethu LLYSFAEN SINGERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED ON 18 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 18 SEP 2019 as amended on 07 Jul 2021 as amended on 23 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN THE LEARNING AND ENJOYMENT OF MUSIC, AND IN PARTICULAR SINGING, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES TO JOIN IN CHORAL SINGING AND TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS INCLUDING UTILISING THE SERVICES OF A MUSICAL DIRECTOR. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.