Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ANTHONY CURTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1163269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £3.60k £4.01k £953 £3.36k £2.08k
Total expenditure £2.69k £3.75k £3.00k £1.67k £2.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A