Accounts and annual returns Embracing Arts

Charity number: 1162812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 02 April 2019 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 23 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window