Financial history Embracing Arts

Charity number: 1162812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £57.01k £37.53k £69.16k £59.96k £48.95k
Total expenditure £27.32k £43.74k £55.68k £62.09k £54.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £11.25k N/A N/A