CREETING ST MARY SCHOOL PSA

Charity number: 1163626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 January 2020 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 October 2017 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required