Accounts and annual returns Bethel Prayer House Camberley

Charity number: 1161705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 30 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 30 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 03 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 03 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window