BASLOW SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required