BRITISH COUNCIL BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1161805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Maria Jack Trustee 23 July 2019 None on record
Eleanor Cecilia Buchdahl Trustee 27 March 2018 None on record
Anna O'Flynn Chair 30 October 2015 None on record
FIRZANA PERVEEN Trustee 31 March 2009 None on record
MARK DAVID HERBERT Trustee 01 November 2011 None on record
Jenny Simms Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
STEPHANIE ASHCROFT Trustee 01 November 2011 None on record
Catherine Anne Stroemer Trustee 23 March 2020 None on record