Financial history GLOBAL INNOVATION FUND

Charity number: 1171353
Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £21.27m £19.85m £15.58m £18.06m £6.16m
Total expenditure £12.19m £15.72m £15.12m £18.06m £17.82m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.35m £5.96m £7.82m £8.80m £3.00m
Income - Donations and legacies £20.97m £19.26m £14.86m £0 £5.86m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £298.00k £586.00k £429.00k £454.00k £225.00k
Income - Other £0 £82.00k £292.00k £1.19m £75.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.26m £14.75m £13.95m £16.78m £16.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £429.00k £448.00k £544.00k £592.00k £744.00k
Expenditure - Governance £859.00k £897.00k £1.09m £1.18m £1.49m
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.03m £8.25m £6.05m £8.20m £5.43m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £501.00k £523.00k £635.00k £690.00k £867.00k